WI SB377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.33 (1) (jo) 5., 23.335 (1) (zgm) 5., 30.50 (10m) (e), 340.01 (50m) (e), 350.01 (10v) (e), 885.235 (1) (d) 5., 939.22 (33) (e), 961.11 (4g), 961.14 (4) (t), 961.32 (2m), 961.38 (1n), 961.41 (1) (h), 961.41 (1m) (h), 961.41 (1q), 961.41 (3g) (e), 961.571 (1) (a) 7., 961.571 (1) (a) 11. e., 961.571 (1) (a) 11. k. and L. and 967.055 (1m) (b) 5.; to renumber 30.681 (1) (bn) and subchapter VI (title) of chapter 50 [precedes 50.90]; to renumber and amend 23.33 (4c) (a) 5., 23.335 (12) (a) 5., 23.335 (12) (b) 5., 30.681 (1) (d), 108.133 (1) (a), 115.35 (1), 346.63 (1) (d), 350.101 (1) (e), 961.01 (14) and 961.34; to amend 20.435 (6) (jm), 23.33 (1) (jo) 1., 23.33 (4c) (a) 4., 23.33 (4c) (b) 3., 23.33 (4c) (b) 4. a., 23.33 (4c) (b) 4. b., 23.33 (4p) (d), 23.33 (13) (b) 1., 23.33 (13) (b) 2., 23.33 (13) (b) 3., 23.33 (13) (b) 4., 23.33 (13) (e), 23.335 (1) (zgm) 1., 23.335 (12) (a) 4., 23.335 (12) (b) 3., 23.335 (12) (b) 4., 23.335 (12) (i), 23.335 (23) (c) 1., 23.335 (23) (c) 2., 23.335 (23) (c) 3., 23.335 (23) (c) 4., 30.50 (10m) (a), 30.681 (1) (b) (title), 30.681 (1) (bn) (title), 30.681 (1) (c), 30.681 (2) (b) (title), 30.681 (2) (c), 30.681 (2) (d) 1. a., 30.681 (2) (d) 1. b., 30.684 (4), 30.80 (6) (d), 49.148 (4) (a), 49.45 (23) (g) 5., 49.79 (1) (b), 50.56 (3), 51.49 (1) (d), 59.54 (25) (title), 59.54 (25) (a) (intro.), 66.0107 (1) (bm), 77.52 (13), 77.53 (10), 111.35 (2) (e), 114.09 (2) (bm) 1. (intro.), 114.09 (2) (bm) 4., 146.40 (1) (bo), 146.81 (1) (L), 146.997 (1) (d) 18., 157.06 (11) (i), 289.33 (3) (d), 340.01 (50m) (a), 343.06 (1) (d), 343.10 (5) (a) 1., 343.10 (5) (a) 2., 343.10 (8) (intro.), 343.12 (7) (a) 9., 343.12 (7) (a) 11., 343.16 (2) (b), 343.16 (5) (a), 343.30 (1p), 343.30 (1q) (c) 1. (intro.), 343.30 (1q) (d) 1., 343.30 (1q) (h), 343.305 (2), 343.305 (3) (a), 343.305 (3) (am), 343.305 (3) (ar) 1., 343.305 (3) (b), 343.305 (5) (b), 343.305 (5) (d), 343.305 (6) (a), 343.305 (7) (a), 343.305 (8) (b) 2. bm., 343.305 (8) (b) 2. d., 343.305 (8) (b) 4m. a., 343.305 (8) (b) 5. b., 343.305 (8) (b) 6. b., 343.305 (9) (a) 5. a., 343.305 (9) (a) 5. c., 343.305 (9) (am) 5. a., 343.305 (9) (am) 5. c., 343.305 (9) (d), 343.305 (10) (c) 1. (intro.), 343.305 (10) (d), 343.305 (10) (em), 343.307 (1) (d), 343.307 (2) (e), 343.31 (1) (am), 343.31 (2), 343.315 (2) (a) 2., 343.315 (2) (a) 5., 343.315 (2) (a) 6., 343.315 (2) (bm) 2., 343.32 (2) (bj), 343.38 (1) (d) 2., 343.44 (1) (a), 343.44 (1) (b), 344.576 (2) (b), 346.63 (1) (b), 346.63 (2) (a) 2., 346.63 (2) (b) 1., 346.63 (2) (b) 2., 346.637, 346.65 (2m) (a), 346.65 (2q), 346.93 (1), 346.935 (1), 346.935 (2), 346.935 (3), 349.02 (2) (b) 4., 349.03 (2m), 349.06 (1m), 350.01 (10v) (a), 350.101 (1) (d), 350.101 (2) (c), 350.101 (2) (d) 1., 350.101 (2) (d) 2., 350.104 (4), 350.11 (3) (a) 1., 350.11 (3) (a) 2., 350.11 (3) (a) 3., 350.11 (3) (a) 4., 350.11 (3) (d), 609.83, 767.41 (5) (am) (intro.), 767.451 (5m) (a), 885.235 (1) (d) 1., 885.235 (1g) (intro.), 885.235 (1m), 885.235 (4), 895.047 (3) (a), 905.04 (4) (f), 939.22 (33) (a), 940.09 (1m) (a), 940.09 (1m) (b), 940.09 (2) (a), 940.09 (2) (b), 940.25 (1m), 940.25 (2) (a), 940.25 (2) (b), 941.20 (1) (bm), 961.41 (1r), 961.41 (3g) (c), 961.41 (3g) (d), 961.41 (3g) (em), 961.47 (1), 961.48 (3), 961.48 (5), 961.49 (1m) (intro.), 961.571 (1) (a) 11. (intro.), 967.055 (1) (a), 967.055 (1) (b), 967.055 (1m) (b) 1., 967.055 (2) (a), 971.365 (1) (a), 971.365 (1) (b), 971.365 (1) (c) and 971.365 (2); and to create 20.115 (7) (ge), 20.435 (1) (gq), 20.435 (1) (jm), 20.566 (1) (bn), 23.33 (1) (k), 23.33 (4c) (a) 2g., 23.33 (4c) (a) 3g., 23.33 (4c) (a) 5. b., 23.33 (4c) (b) 2n., 23.33 (4c) (b) 4. c., 23.335 (1) (zLg), 23.335 (12) (a) 2g., 23.335 (12) (a) 3m., 23.335 (12) (a) 5. b., 23.335 (12) (b) 2g., 23.335 (12) (b) 5. b., 30.50 (13p), 30.50 (13t), 30.681 (1) (b) 1g., 30.681 (1) (bn) 2., 30.681 (1) (d) 2., 30.681 (2) (b) 1g., 30.681 (2) (d) 1. c., subchapter VI of chapter 50 [precedes 50.80], 66.0414, 77.54 (69), 94.56, 100.145, 108.02 (18r), 108.04 (5m), 108.133 (1) (a) 2., 111.32 (9m), 111.32 (11m), 115.35 (1) (a) 6., 121.02 (1) (L) 8., subchapter IV of chapter 139 [precedes 139.97], 146.44, 146.46, 157.06 (11) (hm), 340.01 (66m), 343.305 (5) (dm), 346.63 (1) (d) 2., 346.63 (2) (b) 3., 346.63 (2p), 350.01 (21g), 350.101 (1) (bg), 350.101 (1) (cg), 350.101 (1) (e) 2., 350.101 (2) (bg), 350.101 (2) (d) 3., 632.895 (16p), 767.41 (5) (d), 767.451 (5m) (d), 885.235 (1) (e), 885.235 (1g) (ag), 885.235 (1g) (cg), 885.235 (1L), 939.22 (39g), 940.09 (1) (bg), 940.09 (1) (dg), 940.09 (1g) (bg), 940.09 (1g) (dg), 940.09 (2) (c), 940.25 (1) (bg), 940.25 (1) (dg), 940.25 (2) (c), 941.20 (1) (bg), subchapter VIII of chapter 961 [precedes 961.70] and 973.016 of the statutes; Relating to: marijuana possession, regulation of marijuana distribution and cultivation, medical marijuana, operating a motor vehicle while under the influence of marijuana, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Marijuana possession, regulation of marijuana distribution and cultivation, medical marijuana, operating a motor vehicle while under the influence of marijuana, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-13 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb377 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB377.pdf |