WI SB383 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 29.563 (6m) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: the fee for a first-time annual fishing license for residents who are 16 or 17 years old or who are 65 years old or older. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The fee for a first-time annual fishing license for residents who are 16 or 17 years old or who are 65 years old or older. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 160
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
2020-02-20HouseRead
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and passed
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-19SenateSenator Carpenter added as a coauthor
2020-02-19SenateSenator Larson added as a coauthor
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-10-31SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-10-31SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-10-31SenateExecutive action taken
2019-10-24SenateRepresentative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
2019-10-01SenatePublic hearing held
2019-09-26SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-09-09SenateRepresentative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
2019-08-29SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry
2019-08-29SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback