WI SB384 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 343.301 (1m), 343.31 (3m) and 347.50 (1t); to renumber 343.13 (3); to renumber and amend 343.301 (2m) (a) and 347.413; to consolidate, renumber and amend 343.301 (1g) (am) (intro.) and 1.; to amend 303.08 (10r), 343.10 (1) (b), 343.10 (2) (a) 1., 343.10 (2) (f), 343.10 (5) (a) 1., 343.10 (5) (a) 3., 343.10 (5) (b), 343.10 (7) (cm), 343.10 (7) (e), 343.30 (1q) (b) 2., 343.30 (1q) (b) 3., 343.30 (1q) (b) 4., 343.301 (1g) (am) 2., 343.301 (3) (a), 343.305 (10) (b) 2., 343.305 (10) (b) 3., 343.305 (10) (b) 4., 343.305 (10) (em), 343.31 (3) (bm) 2., 343.31 (3) (bm) 3., 343.31 (3) (bm) 4., 343.43 (1) (d), 347.50 (1) and 347.50 (1s); and to create 343.10 (1) (am), 343.13 (3) (b), 343.301 (2m) (a) 2., 343.301 (2t), 343.301 (6) and 343.302 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: operating privilege of persons who have committed certain offenses related to drunken driving, occupational licenses, ignition interlock devices, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Operating privilege of persons who have committed certain offenses related to drunken driving, occupational licenses, ignition interlock devices, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. David Bowen [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb384 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB384.pdf |