WI SB387 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 71.07 (5n) (a) 6. and 71.28 (5n) (a) 6.; and to create 71.07 (5n) (a) 6. a. and b. and 71.28 (5n) (a) 6. a. and b. of the statutes; Relating to: including crop insurance proceeds in the manufacturing and agricultural tax credit. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Including crop insurance proceeds in the manufacturing and agricultural tax credit. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 167
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateLRB correction
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:39 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 3
2020-01-21SenateRules suspended
2020-01-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21SenateRead a second time
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-01-17SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-17SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-10-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-10-24SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 7, Noes 2
2019-10-24SenateExecutive action taken
2019-10-10SenateRepresentative Ballweg added as a cosponsor
2019-10-10SenatePublic hearing held
2019-09-09SenateRepresentative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
2019-09-06SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-09-05SenateRepresentative Dittrich added as a cosponsor
2019-09-05SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
2019-09-05SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback