WI SB403 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 36.35 (1); and to create 36.02 and 227.01 (13) (Lo) of the statutes; Relating to: free expression within the University of Wisconsin System, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Free expression within the University of Wisconsin System, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-21SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 4, Noes 3
2020-02-21SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 4, Noes 3
2020-02-21SenateExecutive action taken
2020-01-22SenatePublic hearing held
2019-11-19SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga
2019-09-30SenateRepresentative Wittke added as a cosponsor
2019-09-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families
2019-09-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback