WI SB405 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: grant to a hospital for expanding psychiatric bed capacity. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grant to a hospital for expanding psychiatric bed capacity. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-25SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-25SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-25SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-18SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier
2020-02-12SenatePublic hearing held
2019-10-03SenateRepresentative Felzkowski added as a cosponsor
2019-09-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-09-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-09-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback