WI SB408 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 121.004 (7) (c) 1. a., 121.004 (7) (c) 2. and 121.004 (7) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: counting pupils enrolled in four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)
Title
Counting pupils enrolled in four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Representative Tusler withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Senator Johnson added as a coauthor |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb408 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB408.pdf |