WI SB410 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 441.115 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: temporary practice by registered nurses at camps, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Temporary practice by registered nurses at camps, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Representative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb410 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB410.pdf |