WI SB427 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 813.125 (1) (am) 1. and 813.125 (1) (am) 2.; to amend 48.57 (3p) (g) 2., 48.685 (1) (c) 2., 50.065 (1) (e) 1., 103.34 (1) (b) 2., 165.84 (7) (ab) 1., 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 302.11 (1g) (a) 2., 303.07 (2), 813.123 (1) (eg), 813.125 (1) (am) (intro.), 895.45 (1) (a), 938.208 (1) (a), 938.34 (4m) (b) 1., 938.355 (2d) (b) 3., 939.62 (2m) (a) 2m. b., 939.632 (1) (e) 1., 941.29 (1g) (a), 941.291 (1) (b), 949.03 (1) (b), 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a., 969.035 (1), 969.08 (10) (b), 973.01 (2) (c) 2. a., 973.0135 (1) (b) 2., 973.06 (1) (av) 2. a., 973.06 (1) (av) 2. b., 973.123 (1) and 980.01 (6) (b); and to create 343.12 (7) (c) 9j., 813.12 (1) (ar), 813.12 (5b), 813.123 (6g), 813.125 (1) (am) 3., 813.125 (1) (am) 4. (intro.), 813.125 (5b), 939.623, 940.198, 940.225 (1) (d) and 971.109 of the statutes; Relating to: increased penalties for crimes against elder persons; restraining orders for elder persons; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an elder person; sexual assault of an elder person; physical abuse of an elder person; and providing a penalty.
Title
Increased penalties for crimes against elder persons; restraining orders for elder persons; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an elder person; sexual assault of an elder person; physical abuse of an elder person; and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Testin |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Representative Felzkowski added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb427 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB427.pdf |