WI SB428 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 551.508 (1m) (a) and (c), 551.603 (4) (a) and (c) and 551.604 (4); and to create 551.102 (33) and 551.413 of the statutes; Relating to: financial exploitation of vulnerable adults with securities accounts, violations of the Wisconsin Uniform Securities Law, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Title
Financial exploitation of vulnerable adults with securities accounts, violations of the Wisconsin Uniform Securities Law, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Representative Felzkowski added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb428 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB428.pdf |