WI SB43 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-3-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 563.908 and 563.92 (1m) (c) 1.; and to create 563.03 (5r) (c), 563.03 (10q), 563.03 (10r) and 563.935 (9m) of the statutes; Relating to: paddlewheel raffles. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paddlewheel raffles. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateReport vetoed by the Governor on 3-3-2020
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:24 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2019-11-04HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-11-04HouseReport concurrence recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2019-09-25HouseExecutive action taken
2019-07-10HousePublic hearing held
2019-06-27HouseRead first time and referred to committee on State Affairs
2019-06-05HouseReceived from Senate
2019-06-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-05SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-06-05SenateRules suspended
2019-06-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-05SenateRead a second time
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-05-10SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-10SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-05-09SenateExecutive action taken
2019-03-26SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-25SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback