WI SB432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.09 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: transfer of the authority to represent the public interest in proceedings under the Children's Code.
Title
Transfer of the authority to represent the public interest in proceedings under the Children's Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb432 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB432.pdf |