WI SB439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 765.05, 765.08, 765.09 (3) (a), 765.09 (3) (b), 765.12 (2), 765.16 (1m) (intro.), 765.23 and 765.30 (3) (a) and (b) of the statutes; Relating to: marriage license application requirements, issuance, and validity.
Title
Marriage license application requirements, issuance, and validity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb439 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB439.pdf |