WI SB44 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.292 (1) (fc) and 38.04 (34) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to technical college students for apprenticeship expenses and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to technical college students for apprenticeship expenses and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Erpenbach, Carpenter, Larson, Schachtner, Smith, Hansen and Johnson |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |