WI SB440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.01 (13) and 71.05 (8) (b) 1.; and to create 71.05 (25m), 71.26 (3) (vm), 71.34 (1k) (p), 71.45 (2) (a) 21. and 71.83 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: income and franchise tax benefit for investment in Wisconsin opportunity zones and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Income and franchise tax benefit for investment in Wisconsin opportunity zones and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 10 offered by Senators Risser, Larson, Carpenter, Hansen, L. Taylor, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 9 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, Miller, Wirch, Hansen, L. Taylor, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 8 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, Miller, L. Taylor, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 7 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, L. Taylor, Miller, Wirch, Hansen, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 6 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, L. Taylor, Miller, Wirch, Hansen, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senator Miller withdrawn as a coauthor |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-05 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 2) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senators Larson, Smith and Risser |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Larson and Smith |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Larson and Smith |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Larson and Smith |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb440 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB440.pdf |