WI SB45 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (b) 54., 71.26 (1) (i) and 71.45 (1) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: creating individual and corporate income and franchise tax deductions for tuition paid for apprenticeship programs. (FE)
Title
Creating individual and corporate income and franchise tax deductions for tuition paid for apprenticeship programs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb45 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB45.pdf |