WI SB456 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 46.535 of the statutes; Relating to: crisis intervention team grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Crisis intervention team grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-01 | Senate | Representative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb456 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB456.pdf |