WI SB468 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: funding the public defender pay progression and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding the public defender pay progression and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 99, Noes 0
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Born
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-19HouseRepresentative Milroy added as a cosponsor
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:43 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2020-02-17HouseRepresentative Cabrera added as a cosponsor
2020-02-12HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-11HouseRead first time and referred to joint committee on Finance
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateSenators Hansen and Jacque added as coauthors
2020-01-21SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2020-01-21SenateRules suspended
2020-01-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2020-01-21SenateRead a second time
2020-01-21SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-01-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-16SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
2019-10-31SenateRepresentative Hesselbein added as a cosponsor
2019-10-31SenatePublic hearing held
2019-10-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-08SenateRepresentative Thiesfeldt added as a cosponsor
2019-10-02SenateRead first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
2019-10-02SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback