WI SB47 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.10 (1m) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: entering certain places with intent to commit battery and providing a penalty.
Title
Entering certain places with intent to commit battery and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb47 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB47.pdf |