WI SB48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 12.13 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing an elector to show his or her marked ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing an elector to show his or her marked ballot.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-06-17SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-06-17SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-06-12SenateExecutive action taken
2019-05-07SenatePublic hearing held
2019-05-02SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig
2019-02-25SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback