WI SB484 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 76.67 (2); and to create 16.309 (4), 71.07 (8f), 71.10 (4) (fd), 71.28 (8f), 71.30 (3) (cu), 71.47 (8f), 71.49 (1) (cu), 76.6395 and 234.045 of the statutes; Relating to: workforce housing tax credits and economic development revolving loan funds. (FE)
Title
Workforce housing tax credits and economic development revolving loan funds. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb484 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB484.pdf |