WI SB487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0602 (3) (h) 1., 66.0602 (3) (h) 2. a. and 66.0602 (3) (h) 2. b. of the statutes; Relating to: an exception from local levy limits for certain amounts levied for charges assessed by a joint emergency medical services department. (FE)
Title
An exception from local levy limits for certain amounts levied for charges assessed by a joint emergency medical services department. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb487 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB487.pdf |