WI SB493 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: creating a task force on missing and murdered tribal women and girls and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a task force on missing and murdered tribal women and girls and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senator Risser added as a coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Representative Fields added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb493 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB493.pdf |