WI SB496 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-12)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-12)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 118.169; and to create 39.54, 118.169 (title) and 118.169 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring that student identification cards include contact information for suicide prevention hotlines. (FE)
Title
Requiring that student identification cards include contact information for suicide prevention hotlines. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb496 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB496.pdf |