WI SB5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-12)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Representative James added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 40.05 (2) (ar); to amend 40.02 (48) (b) 3., 40.02 (48) (c) and 40.23 (3) (a); and to create 40.02 (17) (n), 40.02 (48) (am) 23., 40.02 (48) (b) 5., 40.05 (1) (a) 7., 40.05 (2) (ap), 40.05 (2) (ar) 2., 40.23 (3) (c), 40.65 (4w), 59.52 (8m) and 111.70 (4) (bn) of the statutes; Relating to: classifying county jailers as protective occupation participants under the Wisconsin Retirement System and the treatment of county jailers under the Municipal Employment Relations Act. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Classifying county jailers as protective occupation participants under the Wisconsin Retirement System and the treatment of county jailers under the Municipal Employment Relations Act. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateRepresentative James added as a cosponsor
2019-03-19SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-18SenateRepresentative Anderson added as a cosponsor
2019-02-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-01SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-01-23SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback