WI SB50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 165.87 of the statutes; Relating to: body cameras on law enforcement officers. (FE)
Title
Body cameras on law enforcement officers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Published 2-29-2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 108 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-26-2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2020-02-20 | House | Read |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |