WI SB510 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (6) (gs) of the statutes; Relating to: watershed enhancement in the village of Plover in Portage County and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Watershed enhancement in the village of Plover in Portage County and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb510 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB510.pdf |