WI SB514 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 441.11 (2) and 448.03 (2) (b); and to create 441.115 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: practicing as a physician assistant or nurse while performing official duties for the armed services or federal health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Practicing as a physician assistant or nurse while performing official duties for the armed services or federal health services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 148
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:48 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateRead a third time and passed
2020-01-21SenateRules suspended
2020-01-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21SenateRead a second time
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-01-08SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-08SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-08SenateExecutive action taken
2019-11-20SenatePublic hearing held
2019-10-23SenateRepresentative Born added as a cosponsor
2019-10-18SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-10-18SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback