WI SB517 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 97.20 (1) (b) of the statutes; relating to: licensing of plants that process certain foods made with milk or milk products. (FE)
Title
Licensing of plants that process certain foods made with milk or milk products. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Senate | Published 4-16-2012 |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 195 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2012 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:27 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24 |
2012-03-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 2 adopted |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Energy, Biotechnology, and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Energy, Biotechnology, and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 2 offered by Senator Lasee |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Lasee |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Energy, Biotechnology, and Consumer Protection |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |