WI SB517 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Published 4-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Published 4-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 111.322 (2m) (a), 111.322 (2m) (b) and 632.897 (6); and to create 103.11 and 893.965 of the statutes; Relating to: leave from employment for the purpose of serving as a bone marrow or organ donor and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Leave from employment for the purpose of serving as a bone marrow or organ donor and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Published 4-2-2016 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 345 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Representatives Rohrkaste and Meyers added as cosponsors |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 88, Noes 10 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 12 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Lassa, Carpenter, L. Taylor, C. Larson, Ringhand, Bewley, Vinehout, Miller, Erpenbach, Risser, Shilling, Hansen and Wirch |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Ringhand, Miller, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Risser, Shilling, Lassa, L. Taylor and C. Larson |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Representative Vos added as a cosponsor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Economic Development and Commerce and rereferred to committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Representative Wachs added as a cosponsor |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Commerce |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Introduced |