WI SB517 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 941.29 (1g) (a) and 971.17 (1g); to amend 165.845 (2) and 973.176 (1); and to create 165.63 (2) (c), 165.845 (1m), 175.35 (2g) (d) 3., 941.29 (1g) (ad), 941.29 (1g) (ah), 941.29 (1m) (ag), 941.29 (1m) (cm), 941.29 (1m) (h), 971.17 (1g) (b) and 973.136 of the statutes; Relating to: the possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence or by a fugitive from justice and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence or by a fugitive from justice and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-27SenateRepresentative Shankland added as a cosponsor
2020-02-19SenateRepresentative Brostoff added as a cosponsor
2020-02-19SenateSenator Risser added as a coauthor
2020-02-14SenateRepresentative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor
2020-02-14SenateRepresentative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor
2020-02-10SenateSenator Larson added as a coauthor
2019-12-30SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-11-11SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-30SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-18SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-10-18SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback