WI SB527 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Published 3-3-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 115.787 (2) (i), 118.305 (6) (a) 1. and 118.305 (6) (a) 3.; to renumber and amend 118.305 (1) (d), 118.305 (3) (f), 118.305 (4) (b) and 118.305 (5); to amend 118.305 (1) (f), 118.305 (2) (f), 118.305 (4) (a) (intro.), 118.305 (4) (a) 2. (intro.), 118.305 (4) (a) 2. d., 118.305 (4) (c) (intro.), 118.305 (4) (c) 1., 118.305 (4) (c) 2., 118.305 (6) (a) (intro.), 118.305 (6) (a) 6., 118.305 (6) (b) 1. and 118.305 (6) (c); and to create 118.305 (1) (d) 2., 118.305 (1) (dm), 118.305 (1) (ek), 118.305 (1) (em), 118.305 (3) (d) 4., 118.305 (3) (f) 2., 118.305 (4) (a) 3., 118.305 (4) (b) 2., 118.305 (4) (c) 3. to 6., 118.305 (4) (cm), 118.305 (4) (d), 118.305 (4) (e), 118.305 (5) (b), 118.305 (6) (a) 1f. and 118.305 (6) (a) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: the seclusion and physical restraint of pupils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The seclusion and physical restraint of pupils.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02SenatePublished 3-3-2020
2020-03-02SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-2-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 118
2020-02-26SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-26-2020
2020-02-25SenateLRB correction
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:49 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateRead a third time and passed
2020-01-21SenateRules suspended
2020-01-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21SenateRead a second time
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-12-20SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-12-20SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-12-19SenateExecutive action taken
2019-11-19SenatePublic hearing held
2019-10-25SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2019-10-25SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback