WI SB537 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 20.235 (1) (a) and 39.49 of the statutes; Relating to: veteran-related tuition grants for certain veterans and dependents enrolled in private nonprofit institutions of higher education and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veteran-related tuition grants for certain veterans and dependents enrolled in private nonprofit institutions of higher education and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 149
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-27SenateLRB correction
2020-02-27SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRepresentatives Skowronski and Spreitzer added as cosponsors
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 99, Noes 0
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
2020-02-20HouseRead
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateSenator Nass added as a coauthor
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-19SenateSenator Carpenter added as a coauthor
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-12SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2020-02-12SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2020-02-12SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-10SenateRepresentative Wittke added as a cosponsor
2020-02-05SenateWithdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
2020-01-10SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-10SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2020-01-10SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2020-01-09SenateExecutive action taken
2019-12-04SenatePublic hearing held
2019-11-25SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling
2019-11-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-31SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families
2019-10-31SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback