WI SB549 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 709.03 (form) G4., G5., G6. and G7 and 709.033 (form) F10. and F11.; to amend 709.02 (1), 709.05 (1), 709.03 (form) F8. and 709.033 (form) E8.; and to create 709.03 (form) G4. and 709.033 (form) F10. of the statutes; Relating to: real estate disclosure reports.
Title
Real estate disclosure reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-14 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb549 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB549.pdf |