WI SB556 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 20.505 (4) (er); and to create 20.505 (4) (er) 1. and 2. of the statutes; Relating to: funding for service award payments and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for service award payments and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Representative Zimmerman added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Representative Kerkman added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb556 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB556.pdf |