WI SB558 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 59.58 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: county registration of animal-drawn vehicles. (FE)
Title
County registration of animal-drawn vehicles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb558 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB558.pdf |