WI SB563 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.25 (58) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for certain extension services of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for certain extension services of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb563 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB563.pdf |