WI SB567 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: grants to independent living centers and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to independent living centers and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senator Schachtner added as a coauthor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Erpenbach added as a coauthor |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb567 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB567.pdf |