WI SB575 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.115 (7) (dm), 20.115 (7) (tm), 71.613 (2) (intro.), 71.613 (2) (a), 71.613 (2) (b), 71.613 (2) (c), 91.04 (intro.) and 91.62 (1) (a); and to create 71.613 (1) (h) 4., 71.613 (2) (am), 71.613 (2) (bm), 71.613 (2) (cm), 71.613 (2) (d), 71.613 (2e), 91.04 (2) (bm) and 91.10 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: farmland preservation implementation grants, agreements, and tax credits and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Farmland preservation implementation grants, agreements, and tax credits and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb575 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB575.pdf |