WI SB58 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.301 (1g) (a) 2. a. of the statutes; Relating to: restricting a person's operating privilege to vehicles equipped with an ignition interlock device. (FE)
Title
Restricting a person's operating privilege to vehicles equipped with an ignition interlock device. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Representative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb58 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB58.pdf |