WI SB584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 60.61 (1m); to renumber and amend 17.25 (1); to amend 17.13 (3), 19.84 (1) (b), 60.30 (1e) (e), 60.307 (3) (b), 60.37 (4) (a), 60.61 (1m) (title), 62.23 (9) (title) and 70.47 (2); and to create 17.13 (2m), 17.25 (1) (a) 2., 60.30 (5) (c), 60.61 (1m) (b) and 62.23 (9) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: the way town board vacancies are filled; public notice requirements for governmental meetings; appointment and removal procedures for certain town officeholders; a process for an applicant to appeal a permit denial to the governing body of a city, village, or town; wages paid to an elected town officer who also serves as a town employee; and the term of appointed town assessors. (FE)
Title
The way town board vacancies are filled; public notice requirements for governmental meetings; appointment and removal procedures for certain town officeholders; a process for an applicant to appeal a permit denial to the governing body of a city, village, or town; wages paid to an elected town officer who also serves as a town employee; and the term of appointed town assessors. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Representative Duchow withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb584 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB584.pdf |