WI SB590 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 33, sections 1em, 1gm, 1im and 1y and 2017 Wisconsin Act 59, sections 2251xg, 2265r and 9452 (2x); Relating to: immunity from revocation of probation, parole, or extended supervision for certain controlled substance offenses.
Title
Immunity from revocation of probation, parole, or extended supervision for certain controlled substance offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb590 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB590.pdf |