WI SB599 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.9715 (title); to renumber 440.9715 (1) and 440.9715 (3); to renumber and amend 440.9712 (1), 440.9715 (intro.) and 440.9715 (2); to amend 440.9712 (title), 440.9712 (1m), 440.9712 (2), 440.972 (title) and (1) (intro.), (a) and (c), 440.972 (2), 440.973 (1), 440.973 (2), 440.973 (3), 440.974 (1) (a), 440.974 (2), 440.975 (3) (cm), 440.978 (2) (intro.), (a) and (c), 440.978 (4) (intro.), 440.978 (5) (intro.) and 440.979 (1); and to create 440.972 (1) (bg) and (br), 440.972 (1m), 440.974 (1) (ag) and (ar), 440.975 (3) (bm) and 440.975 (3) (cr) of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of home inspectors, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulation of home inspectors, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb599 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB599.pdf |