WI SB6 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.65 (2) (am) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: committing a fifth or sixth offense related to operating a vehicle while intoxicated and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Committing a fifth or sixth offense related to operating a vehicle while intoxicated and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from Senate message and take up (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from Senate message and take up (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Published 2-29-2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 106 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-26-2020 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 88, Noes 10 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Bowen, Spreitzer, Ohnstad, Neubauer, Sargent, Subeck, Zamarripa, Emerson, C. Taylor, Crowley, Cabrera and Brostoff |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives McGuire, Ohnstad, Zamarripa, Neubauer, Emerson, Crowley and Cabrera |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, McGuire, Neubauer, Emerson, Goyke, Brostoff, Zamarripa, Vining and Cabrera |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-12 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from Senate message and take up, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |