WI SB60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 980.08 (4) (dm) 1. (intro.), 980.08 (4) (dm) 1. a., b. and c. and 980.08 (4) (dm) 4. of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 184, section 9320 (1); Relating to: applicability of 2017 Wisconsin Act 184; time frame for reports for sexually violent persons petitioning for supervised release; and placement of sexually violent persons on supervised release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applicability of 2017 Wisconsin Act 184; time frame for reports for sexually violent persons petitioning for supervised release; and placement of sexually violent persons on supervised release.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-06-19SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-06-19SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-06-18SenateExecutive action taken
2019-06-17SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen
2019-05-07SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
2019-05-07SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-01SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback