WI SB600 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.46 (2) (b) 21. and 49.46 (2) (bv) of the statutes; Relating to: physical health services and acupuncture under Medical Assistance program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Physical health services and acupuncture under Medical Assistance program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Representative Stuck added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb600 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB600.pdf |