WI SB61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 48.9875 of the statutes; Relating to: a minor contracting for admission to a shelter facility or transitional living program.
Title
A minor contracting for admission to a shelter facility or transitional living program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Representative Gruszynski added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb61 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB61.pdf |