WI SB614 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal and recreate 563.907 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: licensure of local organizations to conduct raffles.
Title
Licensure of local organizations to conduct raffles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb614 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB614.pdf |