WI SB63 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 801.14 (2), 801.15 (5) (b), 801.18 (12) (c) and 802.05 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: service of certain pleadings and other papers by electronic mail.
Title
Service of certain pleadings and other papers by electronic mail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb63 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB63.pdf |