WI SB637 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 87.30 (1d) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: the regulation of nonconforming buildings in a floodplain. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The regulation of nonconforming buildings in a floodplain. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 175
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
2020-02-20HouseRead
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and passed
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-10SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-10SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-10SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken
2020-02-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-01-28SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Bewley and Marklein
2020-01-23SenatePublic hearing held
2020-01-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback